Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HCR2031 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 3, 2022

Engrossed

Bill June 24, 2022
Bill February 23, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis June 23, 2022
Analysis March 7, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 18, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022