House | 06/23/2022 | Introduced in House and read first time | ||
House | 02/09/2022 | Transmit to House | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0) | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-1-0) | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 01/10/2022 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 01/10/2022 | Assigned to Senate ED Committee | ||
Senate | 01/10/2022 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | ||
Senate | 12/22/2021 | Prefile |