Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1036 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 22, 2021

Engrossed

Bill February 9, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis July 12, 2022
Analysis February 9, 2022
Analysis February 4, 2022
Analysis January 28, 2022