Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Chapter 27
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (14-0-0-1-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Assigned to House MAPS Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-0-3-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Senate consent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
Assigned to Senate JUD Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/28/2021
|
Prefile
|
|
|