Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1060 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 28, 2021

Engrossed

Bill January 27, 2022

Chaptered

Bill March 24, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 24, 2022
Analysis March 8, 2022
Analysis March 3, 2022
Analysis January 18, 2022