Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Chapter 134
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (26-0-4-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Senate concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Senate minority caucus: Conference
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Senate Conference Committee recommended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (54-5-1-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
House Committee of the Whole consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
House HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Assigned to House HHS Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-0-3-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Senate consent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
Assigned to Senate HHS Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|