Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1162 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 31, 2022
Bill February 4, 2022

Chaptered

Bill April 14, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 7, 2022
Analysis April 6, 2022
Analysis March 31, 2022
Analysis March 24, 2022
Analysis March 18, 2022
Analysis February 11, 2022
Analysis February 4, 2022
Analysis January 24, 2022