Senate
|
07/06/2022
|
Chapter 344
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2022
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2022
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2022
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2022
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (54-4-2-0)
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2022
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2022
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2022
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2022
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-1-0-1-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Assigned to House JUD Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
Assigned to Senate JUD Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|