Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1177 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 28, 2022
Bill January 12, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 1, 2022

Chaptered

Bill July 7, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis June 22, 2022
Analysis March 18, 2022
Analysis March 14, 2022
Analysis January 24, 2022
Analysis January 18, 2022