Senate | 04/06/2022 | Chapter 112 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Governor Signed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Transmit to Senate | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-3-0) | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | House majority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | House consent calendar | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | House read second time | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | House RULES Committee action: DP/C&P, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Introduced in House and read first time | ||
House | 02/25/2022 | Transmit to House | ||
Senate | 02/24/2022 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) | ||
Senate | 02/24/2022 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | ||
Senate | 02/23/2022 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/23/2022 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/23/2022 | Senate RULES Committee action: Do pass and proper for consideration, voting: (7-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 01/20/2022 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 01/19/2022 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 01/19/2022 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |