Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1214 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 25, 2022

Chaptered

Bill April 7, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 5, 2022
Analysis March 31, 2022
Analysis March 18, 2022