Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1239 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 10, 2022

Chaptered

Bill May 5, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis May 3, 2022
Analysis May 2, 2022
Analysis March 14, 2022
Analysis March 8, 2022
Analysis January 28, 2022