Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1319 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 9, 2022
Bill January 21, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 9, 2022

Chaptered

Bill May 23, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis May 17, 2022
Analysis May 9, 2022
Analysis April 13, 2022
Analysis March 24, 2022
Analysis March 18, 2022
Analysis March 9, 2022
Analysis February 24, 2022
Analysis February 18, 2022