Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
Chapter 227
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (42-9-9-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-1-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Assigned to House TRANS Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-1-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Senate consent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Senate TAT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Assigned to Senate TAT Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|