Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1320 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 10, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis May 13, 2022
Analysis March 18, 2022
Analysis March 14, 2022
Analysis January 27, 2022

Chaptered

Bill May 10, 2022