House
|
03/23/2022
|
House Committee action: Do pass on reconsideration, voting: (9-3-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
House TRANS Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (6-6-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Assigned to House Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Assigned to House TRANS Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (18-10-2-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-2-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|