Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1377 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 23, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 24, 2022
Analysis March 14, 2022
Analysis February 24, 2022
Analysis February 9, 2022
Analysis February 4, 2022