Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Chapter 47
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (42-16-2-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
House LARA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Assigned to House LARA Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-1-2-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Senate consent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Assigned to Senate NREW Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|