Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1405 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 10, 2022

Chaptered

Bill March 25, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 24, 2022
Analysis March 8, 2022
Analysis March 3, 2022
Analysis January 31, 2022