House | 03/21/2022 | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-2-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | House read second time | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Assigned to House HHS Committee | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Introduced in House and read first time | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Transmit to House | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-11-3-0) | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
Senate | 02/23/2022 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/23/2022 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/23/2022 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/21/2022 | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-1-0) | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |