Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1467 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 2, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 24, 2022
Analysis March 18, 2022
Analysis March 2, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022