House
|
03/22/2022
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Assigned to House JUD Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Senate consent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Assigned to Senate JUD Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|