Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1565 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 28, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 23, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 10, 2022
Analysis March 7, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022