Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1601 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-Senate Engrossed board of chiropractic examiners; continuation State of Arizona Senate Fifty-fifth Legislature Second Regular Session 2022 CHAPTER 51 SENATE BILL 1601 An Act repealing section 41-3022.03, Arizona Revised Statutes; amending title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, by adding section 41-3030.03; relating to the state board of chiropractic examiners. (TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)
1+Senate Engrossed board of chiropractic examiners; continuation State of Arizona Senate Fifty-fifth Legislature Second Regular Session 2022 SENATE BILL 1601 An Act repealing section 41-3022.03, Arizona Revised Statutes; amending title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, by adding section 41-3030.03; relating to the state board of chiropractic examiners. (TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)
2+
3+
24
35
46
57
68
79 Senate Engrossed board of chiropractic examiners; continuation
810 State of Arizona Senate Fifty-fifth Legislature Second Regular Session 2022
9-CHAPTER 51
1011 SENATE BILL 1601
1112
1213 Senate Engrossed
1314
1415
1516
1617 board of chiropractic examiners; continuation
18+
19+
1720
1821
1922
2023
2124
2225
2326
2427 State of Arizona
2528
2629 Senate
2730
2831 Fifty-fifth Legislature
2932
3033 Second Regular Session
3134
3235 2022
3336
3437
3538
3639
3740
3841
3942
40-CHAPTER 51
43+SENATE BILL 1601
4144
4245
43-
44-SENATE BILL 1601
4546
4647
4748
4849 An Act
4950
5051
5152
5253 repealing section 41-3022.03, Arizona Revised Statutes; amending title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, by adding section 41-3030.03; relating to the state board of chiropractic examiners.
5354
5455
5556
5657
5758
5859 (TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)
5960
6061
6162
6263 Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Arizona: Section 1. Repeal Section 41-3022.03, Arizona Revised Statutes, is repealed. Sec. 2. Title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended by adding section 41-3030.03, to read: START_STATUTE41-3030.03. State board of chiropractic examiners; termination July 1, 2030 A. the state board of chiropractic examiners terminates on july 1, 2030. b. Title 32, chapter 8 and this section are repealed on january 1, 2031. END_STATUTE Sec. 3. Purpose Pursuant to section 41-2955, subsection B, Arizona Revised Statutes, the legislature continues the state board of chiropractic examiners to promote the safe and professional practice of chiropractic. Sec. 4. Retroactivity Sections 1 and 2 of this act are effective retroactively to July 1, 2022.
6364
6465 Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Arizona:
6566
6667 Section 1. Repeal
6768
6869 Section 41-3022.03, Arizona Revised Statutes, is repealed.
6970
7071 Sec. 2. Title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended by adding section 41-3030.03, to read:
7172
7273 START_STATUTE41-3030.03. State board of chiropractic examiners; termination July 1, 2030
7374
7475 A. the state board of chiropractic examiners terminates on july 1, 2030.
7576
7677 b. Title 32, chapter 8 and this section are repealed on january 1, 2031. END_STATUTE
7778
7879 Sec. 3. Purpose
7980
8081 Pursuant to section 41-2955, subsection B, Arizona Revised Statutes, the legislature continues the state board of chiropractic examiners to promote the safe and professional practice of chiropractic.
8182
8283 Sec. 4. Retroactivity
8384
8485 Sections 1 and 2 of this act are effective retroactively to July 1, 2022.
85-
86- APPROVED BY THE GOVERNOR MARCH 23, 2022. FILED IN THE OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE MARCH 23, 2022.
87-
88-
89-
90-
91-
92-
93-
94-APPROVED BY THE GOVERNOR MARCH 23, 2022.
95-
96-
97-
98-FILED IN THE OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE MARCH 23, 2022.