Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1601 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 03/25/2022

                            Senate Engrossed   board of chiropractic examiners; continuation           State of Arizona Senate Fifty-fifth Legislature Second Regular Session 2022           CHAPTER 51       SENATE BILL 1601          An Act   repealing section 41-3022.03, Arizona Revised Statutes; amending title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, by adding section 41-3030.03; relating to the state board of chiropractic examiners.     (TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)   

 

 

Senate Engrossed   board of chiropractic examiners; continuation
State of Arizona Senate Fifty-fifth Legislature Second Regular Session 2022
CHAPTER 51
SENATE BILL 1601

Senate Engrossed

 

board of chiropractic examiners; continuation

 

 

 

State of Arizona

Senate

Fifty-fifth Legislature

Second Regular Session

2022

 

 

 

CHAPTER 51

 

SENATE BILL 1601

 

An Act

 

repealing section 41-3022.03, Arizona Revised Statutes; amending title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, by adding section 41-3030.03; relating to the state board of chiropractic examiners.

 

 

(TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)

 

 Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Arizona: Section 1. Repeal Section 41-3022.03, Arizona Revised Statutes, is repealed. Sec. 2. Title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended by adding section 41-3030.03, to read: START_STATUTE41-3030.03. State board of chiropractic examiners; termination July 1, 2030 A. the state board of chiropractic examiners terminates on july 1, 2030. b. Title 32, chapter 8 and this section are repealed on january 1, 2031. END_STATUTE  Sec. 3. Purpose  Pursuant to section 41-2955, subsection B, Arizona Revised Statutes, the legislature continues the state board of chiropractic examiners to promote the safe and professional practice of chiropractic. Sec. 4. Retroactivity  Sections 1 and 2 of this act are effective retroactively to July 1, 2022. 

Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Arizona:

Section 1. Repeal

Section 41-3022.03, Arizona Revised Statutes, is repealed.

Sec. 2. Title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended by adding section 41-3030.03, to read:

START_STATUTE41-3030.03. State board of chiropractic examiners; termination July 1, 2030

A. the state board of chiropractic examiners terminates on july 1, 2030.

b. Title 32, chapter 8 and this section are repealed on january 1, 2031. END_STATUTE 

Sec. 3. Purpose 

Pursuant to section 41-2955, subsection B, Arizona Revised Statutes, the legislature continues the state board of chiropractic examiners to promote the safe and professional practice of chiropractic.

Sec. 4. Retroactivity 

Sections 1 and 2 of this act are effective retroactively to July 1, 2022.

       APPROVED BY THE GOVERNOR MARCH 23, 2022.   FILED IN THE OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE MARCH 23, 2022. 

 

 

 

APPROVED BY THE GOVERNOR MARCH 23, 2022.

 

FILED IN THE OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE MARCH 23, 2022.