House | 03/22/2022 | House ED Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (5-5-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | House read second time | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Assigned to House ED Committee | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Introduced in House and read first time | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Transmit to House | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained | ||
Senate | 02/21/2022 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/21/2022 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/21/2022 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Senate ED Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | Assigned to Senate ED Committee | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |