Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1626 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 31, 2022
Bill January 31, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 9, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 21, 2022
Analysis March 9, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022
Analysis February 12, 2022