Senate
|
06/13/2022
|
Chapter 290
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2022
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2022
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
House final reading PASSED, voting: (33-20-7-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (17-12-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
Senate Conference adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2022
|
House Conference adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2022
|
House Conference caucus date
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2022
|
Senate Conference caucus date
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2022
|
Senate Minority report
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2022
|
Senate Conference report: That the Senate accept the House amendments with exceptions and the bill be further amended.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2022
|
House Minority report
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Senate Conference members: QUEZADA has been replaced by MARSH
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
House Conference members: UDALL, BOLICK, PAWLIK
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
House Conference appointed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Senate Conference members: KERR, GRAY, MARSH
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Senate Conference appointed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Senate minority caucus: Conference
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Senate Conference Committee recommended
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (37-20-3-0)
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-1-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Assigned to House ED Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-10-3-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Assigned to Senate ED Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|