LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Arizona AZ
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1630
Draft Versions
AZ
Arizona Senate Bill SB1630
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Arizona 2022 Regular Session
Arizona Senate Bill SB1630
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 31, 2022
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
June 1, 2022
Compare
Bill
April 19, 2022
Compare
Bill
March 3, 2022
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
June 14, 2022
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
June 7, 2022
Analysis
May 23, 2022
Analysis
April 25, 2022
Analysis
April 20, 2022
Analysis
March 24, 2022
Analysis
March 18, 2022
Analysis
March 2, 2022
Analysis
February 17, 2022
Analysis
February 14, 2022
Analysis
February 11, 2022