Senate
|
06/13/2022
|
Chapter 291
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2022
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2022
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
House final reading PASSED, voting: (36-17-7-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (16-13-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
Senate Conference adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2022
|
House Conference adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
House Conference caucus date
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Senate Conference caucus date
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Senate Minority report
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Senate Conference report: That the Senate accept the House amendments with exceptions and the bill be further amended.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
House Conference members: BLACKMAN, HERNANDEZ M, NGUYEN
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
House Conference appointed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Senate Conference members: KERR, PETERSEN, STEELE
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Senate Conference appointed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Senate Conference Committee recommended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Senate minority caucus: Conference
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (36-22-2-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
House Committee of the Whole consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
House JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Assigned to House JUD Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Assigned to Senate JUD Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|