Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1633 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2022

Engrossed

Bill May 13, 2022
Bill March 24, 2022
Bill February 23, 2022

Chaptered

Bill June 14, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis June 8, 2022
Analysis May 9, 2022
Analysis May 4, 2022
Analysis April 19, 2022
Analysis March 24, 2022
Analysis March 18, 2022
Analysis March 14, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 18, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022