Senate
|
06/30/2022
|
Chapter 333
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2022
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2022
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2022
|
Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (24-0-6-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2022
|
Senate concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2022
|
Senate Conference Committee recommended
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2022
|
Senate minority caucus: Conference
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2022
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2022
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0)
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2022
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2022
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2022
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2022
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-5-0-2-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (15-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Assigned to House APPROP Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Assigned to House MAPS Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-0-4-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|