Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1712 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2022

Engrossed

Bill June 22, 2022
Bill March 4, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis September 6, 2022
Analysis June 23, 2022
Analysis June 22, 2022
Analysis June 21, 2022
Analysis March 21, 2022
Analysis March 17, 2022
Analysis March 4, 2022
Analysis March 3, 2022
Analysis February 4, 2022

Chaptered

Bill July 1, 2022