Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1718 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 23, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 8, 2022
Analysis March 7, 2022
Analysis March 3, 2022
Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 11, 2022