|
06/23/2022
|
Transmitted to Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2022
|
Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (25-3-2-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2022
|
Senate concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2022
|
Senate minority caucus: Conference
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2022
|
Senate Conference Committee recommended
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2022
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2022
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (34-25-1-0)
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2022
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2022
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2022
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2022
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
House LARA Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-1-1-1-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Assigned to House LARA Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (20-8-2-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Senate consent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Assigned to Senate ED Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|