Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SCR1049 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2022

Engrossed

Bill June 23, 2022
Bill February 23, 2022

Enrolled

Bill June 28, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis June 23, 2022
Analysis March 24, 2022
Analysis March 17, 2022
Analysis February 13, 2022
Analysis February 11, 2022