Senate
|
06/16/2023
|
Chapter 166
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2023
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2023
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
House final reading PASSED, voting: (60-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
House concurs
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
House minority caucus: Conference
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
House Conference Committee recommended
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Senate additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Senate consent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Assigned to Senate NREW Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (58-2-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
House NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2023
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2023
|
Assigned to House NREW Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2023
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|