Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2022 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 9, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 15, 2023
Bill February 22, 2023

Chaptered

Bill June 22, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis June 21, 2023
Analysis May 22, 2023
Analysis May 15, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis February 23, 2023
Analysis February 21, 2023
Analysis February 12, 2023