House | 02/28/2023 | House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | House refer to additional Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | House majority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | House consent calendar | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | House read second time | ||
House | 01/26/2023 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 01/26/2023 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | ||
House | 01/26/2023 | Introduced in House and read first time |