Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2075 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 23, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis March 1, 2023
Analysis February 17, 2023
Analysis February 13, 2023