Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-3-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Assigned to Senate HHS Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (46-14-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (14-1-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2023
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2023
|
Assigned to House APPROP Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2023
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|