Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2087 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note January 23, 2023
Bill January 11, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 22, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis March 10, 2023
Analysis February 22, 2023
Analysis January 26, 2023
Analysis January 20, 2023