Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-2-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate MAPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-1-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Assigned to Senate MAPS Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (15-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2023
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Assigned to House MAPS Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|