Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2089 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 3, 2023
Bill January 11, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 16, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 6, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis February 21, 2023
Analysis January 31, 2023
Analysis January 26, 2023