Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2145 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill June 12, 2023
Bill February 22, 2023

Chaptered

Bill June 23, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis June 13, 2023
Analysis June 12, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis February 23, 2023
Analysis February 17, 2023
Analysis February 9, 2023