Senate | 07/31/2023 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 07/31/2023 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Transmit to Senate | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | House third reading PASSED voting: (36-24-0-0) | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | House majority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | House consent calendar | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | House read second time | ||
House | 01/18/2023 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 01/18/2023 | Assigned to House HHS Committee | ||
House | 01/18/2023 | Introduced in House and read first time |