Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2211 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 10, 2023
Bill January 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 16, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis February 21, 2023
Analysis January 31, 2023
Analysis January 26, 2023