Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2298 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 5, 2023
Bill February 21, 2023

Chaptered

Bill April 19, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 13, 2023
Analysis April 5, 2023
Analysis March 9, 2023
Analysis March 6, 2023
Analysis February 23, 2023
Analysis February 10, 2023
Analysis February 6, 2023