Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2298 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 04/19/2023

                            Senate Engrossed House Bill   planned community authority; public roadways           State of Arizona House of Representatives Fifty-sixth Legislature First Regular Session 2023           CHAPTER 84       HOUSE BILL 2298          An Act   amending section 33-1818, Arizona Revised Statutes; relating to planned communities.     (TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)   

 

 

Senate Engrossed House Bill   planned community authority; public roadways
State of Arizona House of Representatives Fifty-sixth Legislature First Regular Session 2023
CHAPTER 84
HOUSE BILL 2298

Senate Engrossed House Bill

 

planned community authority; public roadways

 

 

 

State of Arizona

House of Representatives

Fifty-sixth Legislature

First Regular Session

2023

 

 

 

CHAPTER 84

 

HOUSE BILL 2298

 

An Act

 

amending section 33-1818, Arizona Revised Statutes; relating to planned communities.

 

 

(TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)

 

 Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Arizona: Section 1. Section 33-1818, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended to read: START_STATUTE33-1818. Community authority over public roadways; vote of the membership; applicability A. For any planned community for which the declaration is recorded after December 31, 2014 and notwithstanding any provision in the community documents, after the period of declarant control, an association has no authority over and shall not regulate any roadway for which the ownership has been dedicated to or is otherwise held by a governmental entity. B. This section applies only to those planned communities for which the declaration is recorded after December 31, 2014. B. After the period of declarant control, for any planned community for which the declaration was recorded before January 1, 2015 and that regulates any roadway for which the ownership has been dedicated to or is otherwise held by a governmental entity, the existing regulations continue in effect until either of the following occurs: 1. Not later than June 30, 2025, the planned community shall call a meeting of the membership on the question of whether to continue to regulate public roadways. If the number of owners voting at the meeting on the question is sufficient to constitute a quorum of the membership and a majority of that number votes to continue regulating public roadways in the planned community, the planned community retains its authority to regulate those public roadways. The board of directors shall record in the office of the county recorder of the county in which the planned community is located a document confirming that the planned community continues to regulate the public roadways. 2. If the vote prescribed by paragraph 1 of this subsection fails or if the planned community does not hold a vote of the membership in compliance with paragraph 1 of this subsection, the planned community no longer has authority to regulate the public roadways in the planned community and any existing regulations expire. C. This section does not apply to any one-way streets, without regard to ownership, or to any privately owned roadways. END_STATUTE 

Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Arizona:

Section 1. Section 33-1818, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended to read:

START_STATUTE33-1818. Community authority over public roadways; vote of the membership; applicability

A. For any planned community for which the declaration is recorded after December 31, 2014 and notwithstanding any provision in the community documents, after the period of declarant control, an association has no authority over and shall not regulate any roadway for which the ownership has been dedicated to or is otherwise held by a governmental entity.

B. This section applies only to those planned communities for which the declaration is recorded after December 31, 2014.

B. After the period of declarant control, for any planned community for which the declaration was recorded before January 1, 2015 and that regulates any roadway for which the ownership has been dedicated to or is otherwise held by a governmental entity, the existing regulations continue in effect until either of the following occurs:

1. Not later than June 30, 2025, the planned community shall call a meeting of the membership on the question of whether to continue to regulate public roadways. If the number of owners voting at the meeting on the question is sufficient to constitute a quorum of the membership and a majority of that number votes to continue regulating public roadways in the planned community, the planned community retains its authority to regulate those public roadways. The board of directors shall record in the office of the county recorder of the county in which the planned community is located a document confirming that the planned community continues to regulate the public roadways.

2. If the vote prescribed by paragraph 1 of this subsection fails or if the planned community does not hold a vote of the membership in compliance with paragraph 1 of this subsection, the planned community no longer has authority to regulate the public roadways in the planned community and any existing regulations expire.

C. This section does not apply to any one-way streets, without regard to ownership, or to any privately owned roadways. END_STATUTE

       APPROVED BY THE GOVERNOR APRIL 18, 2023.   FILED IN THE OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE APRIL 18, 2023. 

 

 

 

APPROVED BY THE GOVERNOR APRIL 18, 2023.

 

FILED IN THE OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE APRIL 18, 2023.