Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate JUD Committee action: Discussed and Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Assigned to Senate JUD Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (58-2-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
House motion to reconsider third reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
House third reading FAILED voting: (29-30-1-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
House JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2023
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2023
|
Assigned to House JUD Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2023
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|